Financial history VIDYANANDA COLLEGE OLD STUDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1154539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £2.49k £403 £3.09k £2.76k £1.59k
Total expenditure £3.03k £2.28k £3.28k £5.33k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A