ONUA DO KUO

Charity number: 1148633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £4.06k £6.78k £7.56k £7.92k £5.50k
Total expenditure £2.02k £5.97k £6.10k £6.77k £4.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A