NEW SPRING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In furtherance of the charity's objects activities include delivery of training course and healing events in the UK and abroad, development of prayer ministry and running outreach events. The charity undertakes fundraising events with a view to securing its own training and ministry centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Czech Republic
- Ireland
- Scotland
- Slovakia
Governance
- 25 October 2012: Standard registration
- LITTLE WAY OF HEALING MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Theresia Maria Jones | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Jane Burton | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev PAUL PAGE-TICKELL | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Myriam Rincon de Rincon | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ANNE CALLAGHAN | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY SCHMITZ | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN MUI | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
FATHER LAURENCE JOSEPH BRASSILL O S A | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.83k | £23.24k | £59.08k | £111.91k | £99.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.60k | £13.98k | £34.47k | £54.93k | £98.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2022
(These accounts |
26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/2013 as amended on 30 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER AND ADVANCE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIGIOUS, HEALING, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH INCLUDING ECUMENICAL OUTREACH MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING OR ENABLING HEALING MINISTRY, EVANGELISING AND PREACHING AND PRAYERFUL SUPPORT CENTRED ON LOVE OF GOD AND OF OTHER PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Godfrey Mansell & Co
Hales Court
Stourbridge Road
HALESOWEN
West Midlands
B63 3TT
- Phone:
- 01224481810
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window