THE CORNUBIAN ARTS AND SCIENCE TRUST

Charity number: 1149763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £305.41k £595.26k £736.06k £139.08k £145.34k
Total expenditure £98.16k £148.53k £362.53k £110.03k £97.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.25k £50.00k £2.50k £2.50k £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £552.70k £691.80k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £6.00k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £42.56k £38.26k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £148.53k £362.53k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.73k £3.36k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A