THE AMB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITY ESTABLISHED IN 2012 TO HELP AND ASSIST WORTHY CAUSES IN THE BRIDLINGTON AREA OF EAST YORKSHIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Romania
Governance
- 22 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Bell | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Nick Burton | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mr Mike Burton | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.44k | £505.31k | £500.19k | £0 | £24.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.91k | £332.70k | £315.35k | £167.40k | £168.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £500.00k | £500.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £5.31k | £192 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £332.70k | £315.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £100 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £332.60k | £315.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £100 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 June 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST FOR SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR FOR ANY PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO:3.1THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL,OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WHICH CARRY OUT OR SUPPORT MEDICAL RESEARCH TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS THEREOF AND THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO PROVIDE PALLIATIVE CARE TO SUCH PERSONS;3.2THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ANY MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT;3.3THE MAINTENANCE,IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES,OR RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES,HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES;3.4PROMOTE AND FURTHER COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND AMATEUR SPORTS BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO ORGANISE COACHING AND TRAINING AND TO PROVIDE,SECURE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC GROUNDS,FACILITIES AND PREMISES FOR THE PLAYING OF TEAM GAMES AND AMATEUR SPORTS;3.5BENEFIT PEOPLE IN CHARITABLE NEED IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ANY MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT;3.6THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO HELP CREATE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT;3.7THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO SUPPORT THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OF SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE SO THAT FUTURE GENERATIONS MIGHT APPRECIATE AND LEARN FROM THEM;3.8PROMOTE,FOSTER AND MAINTAIN FOR THE EDUCATIONAL ADVANCEMENT AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AN APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN GENERAL INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA,BALLET AND OTHER FORMS OF DANCE,MUSIC,SINGING,OPERA,LITERATURE,SCULPTURE AND PAINTING BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO PROVIDE,MAINTAIN,DEVELOP AND SUPPORT TRAINING,EDUCATIONAL COURSES,SEMINARS,CONFERENCES,LESSONS,CLASSES,PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS AND PERFORMANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Celebration Packaging Ltd
Celebration House
Stanley Street
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE14 1DY
- Phone:
- 01283538259
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window