Accounts and annual returns SUGAR AWARE

Charity number: 1150646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 12 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required