Financial history REAL LIFE CHURCH, SUTTON COLDFIELD

Charity number: 1149821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £140.46k £197.70k £212.63k £231.45k £226.35k
Total expenditure £118.57k £151.61k £170.02k £179.44k £165.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A