Governing document THE LITTLE BOOKWORMS LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 SEP 2017 as amended on 23 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CAUSE AND EFFECTS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND OTHER DIFFICULT SOCIAL TOPICS WITH A VIEW TO RAISING AWARENESS, IN PARTICULAR THE CONSEQUENCES FOR AND NEEDS OF ACTUAL AND POTENTIAL VICTIMS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS, THE CHARITY WILL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WORK WITH EDUCATIONAL BODIES AND COMMUNITIES TO RAISE AWARENESS, EMPOWERING PEOPLE WITH KNOWLEDGE ABOUT PEOPLE TRAFFICKING AND OTHER DIFFICULT SOCIAL TOPICS. TO RAISE THAT AWARENESS BY WAY OF PRESENTATIONS, USING ACTIVITY, MUSIC, DRAMA, FUN, LAUGHTER AND OTHER GENERAL AWARENESS PROGRAMMES BUT NEVER THROUGH THE USE OF SHOCK OR FEAR TACTICS. WE AIM TO INSPIRE PEOPLE OF ALL AGES BUT PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE TO MAKE A POSITIVE DIFFERENCE IN THEIR OWN LIVES AND LIVES OF OTHERS BOTH NOW AND IN THE FUTURE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.