Accounts and annual returns WARRINGTON TOWN IN THE COMMUNITY LTD

Charity number: 1156068
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 June 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 09 June 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 October 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 October 2020 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 02 April 2020 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 02 April 2020 307 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 09 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window