Financial history WARRINGTON TOWN IN THE COMMUNITY LTD

Charity number: 1156068
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £56.70k £70.06k £26.18k £18.80k £38.27k
Total expenditure £49.45k £61.80k £26.54k £17.00k £14.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A