MUSTARD SEED AUTISM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Support with communication, social & sensory difficulties - Play & Sensory Motor Therapy - Parent courses - Sibling support group - OT for schools support service - Courses for schools & other professionals Services for families with children aged between 3 and 11, with an autism diagnosis, within a 10 mile radius of Farnborough, Hampshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 June 2024
Total income includes £17,219 from 11 government contract(s) and £26,180 from 6 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 September 2012: Standard registration
- 24 February 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1202378 MUSTARD SEED AUTISM TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 10/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.16k | £110.22k | £132.13k | £167.02k | £126.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.27k | £112.34k | £117.64k | £150.60k | £124.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.18k | £15.88k | £31.59k | £27.05k | £17.22k | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.30k | £14.80k | £7.15k | £35.11k | £26.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 June 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND RELATED CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTION, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window