Financial history AL MAHADUL ISLAMI

Charity number: 1150407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £159.88k £165.39k £134.51k £157.93k £716.23k
Total expenditure £78.65k £80.23k £90.78k £84.70k £179.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.93k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £534.63k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £76.68k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £101.64k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.28k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £42.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £137.13k