FAST PROJECT - LONDON

Charity number: 1149513
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

EQUIPPING PEOPLE IN AND AROUND THE PATMORE ESTATE LONDON TO POSITIVELY CONTRIBUTE TO THE TRANSFORMATION OF THEIR OWN LIVES, FAMILIES AND COMMUNITY. BUILDING A SAFE AND HEALTHY ENVIRONMENT TOGETHER WHERE ALL BELONG AND SHARE HOPE FOR THE FUTURE. INCLUDING OUTREACH, SPORT, MENTORING, EMPLOYABILITY, FILM, TRIPS & COMMUNITY EVENTS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014

Total income: £35,022
Total expenditure: £36,307

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 2012: Standard registration
  • 30 November 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 30 November 2015: Funds transferred to 1152146 E:MERGE (UK) LIMITED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £22.80k £35.02k
Total expenditure £14.26k £36.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 13 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 01 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 01 August 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 27 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 13 August 2013 On Time