LAMBETH MASJID & PROGRESSIVE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1149173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 03 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 09 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 13 November 2019 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 28 March 2018 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required