LAMBETH MASJID & PROGRESSIVE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1149173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £12.50k £25.00k £24.53k £18.36k £18.63k
Total expenditure £8.50k £11.40k £11.57k £15.23k £18.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A