SPONSORING ACADEMIC AND MEDICAL ACCESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports children and families in The Gambia, West Africa. We provide access to education through sponsorship at nursery or school and provide access to medication and healthcare. We provide clothing and food items for children and families in The Gambia alongside supporting family members getting into employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- The Gambia
Governance
- 18 September 2012: Standard registration
- S.A.A.M.A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miss Kate Elizabeth | Chair | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Roughley | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ann Murphy | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY CARTER | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.81k | £11.06k | £15.01k | £12.64k | £13.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.88k | £11.25k | £15.02k | £13.45k | £12.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF GAMBIAN CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THEIR USE AT SCHOOL INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR THE CONSTRUCTION & IMPROVEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. TO ADVANCE ACCESS TO ESSENTIAL HEALTHCARE OF GAMBIANS BY PROVISION OF ANNUAL HEALTH CHECKS AND EMERGENCY TREATMENT FUND IN LOCALISED AREAS. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN YOUNG GAMBIANS IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT THROUGH EDUCATION, START UP FUNDS AND TRAINING
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Childwall Park Avenue
Childwall
LIVERPOOL
L16 0JG
- Phone:
- 01517222791
- Email:
- saamainthegambia@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window