THE MADANI ACADEMY PORTSMOUTH LTD

Charity number: 1149317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 22 December 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 22 December 2019 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 19 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 November 2016 On time Download