ST MARY DEVIZES TRUST

Charity number: 1151049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 August 2020 20 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 21 August 2019 20 December 2020 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 21 August 2018 20 December 2020 548 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 21 August 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 21 August 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 August 2016 Not Required