Financial history OPEN WING TRUST

Charity number: 1149773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.40k £4.66k £0 £60 £3.49k
Total expenditure £5.42k £4.66k £6.91k £6.23k £4.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A