Accounts and annual returns NEW LEAF SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1150552
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 15 days
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 15 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 August 2020 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 August 2020 42 days late Download Open in new window