REFUGEE AND MIGRANT NETWORK SUTTON

Charity number: 1150500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Morrison Trustee 22 October 2014 None on record
LISA WEBSTER Trustee 03 September 2018 None on record
ANNE TOWNER Chair 14 January 2013 None on record
Namrata Chowdhary Trustee 07 February 2020 None on record
LORRI DAWSON Trustee 14 January 2013 None on record
Dr Carlos de Sousa Trustee 22 May 2020 None on record
DEBORAH WROE Trustee 14 January 2013 None on record
OLWEN EDWARDS Trustee 14 January 2013 None on record
John Branford Trustee 23 July 2021 None on record
BRIONY THOMAS Trustee 10 March 2017
HOME-START EPSOM, EWELL & BANSTEAD Received: On time
HOME-START SURREY Received: On time