Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN PUDDLETOWN

Charity number: 1150071
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £66.80k £58.55k £52.23k £53.98k £50.58k
Total expenditure £59.03k £50.55k £47.80k £89.48k £51.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £650 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £650 N/A N/A £650 N/A