DAY OF SUNSHINE (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1149764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £62.55k £58.71k £46.01k £42.42k £51.03k
Total expenditure £52.26k £53.69k £58.73k £55.12k £39.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £18.00k