WESTON PLANET

Charity number: 1156960
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 July 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 April 2021 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 April 2021 307 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 28 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 May 2017 On time Download