WESTON PLANET

Charity number: 1156960
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £27.26k £31.64k £26.84k £28.63k £15.01k
Total expenditure £27.26k £31.64k £26.84k £25.81k £15.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A