Trustees WESTON PLANET
Charity number: 1156960

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Doyle | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Peter Lee | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Ozlem Cilasun | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jones | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Chubb | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Pimm | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Haley | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penny Edrich | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Beaumont MA BM BCH | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Maksimczyk | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN HAGGERTY | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR STEVEN CHRISTIAN PEARSE-DANKER | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.