REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD CITY OF ZION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 May 2013: Standard registration
- RCCG CITY OF ZION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLATUNBOSUN ADAMSON | Chair | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ademola Falegan | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oghenefegor Obaro | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.26k | £68.08k | £141.45k | £135.71k | £168.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.11k | £62.84k | £85.87k | £135.28k | £125.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/09/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE AND IN THE COMMUNITY. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND NEED, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS AS EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN OUTREACH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
R C C G City of Zion
Unit 1 Restwell House
Coldhams Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3EW
- Phone:
- 01223607680
- Email:
- info@rccgcityofzion.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window