Accounts and annual returns CARIBBEAN BIODIVERSITY FUND

Charity number: 1149889
Charity reporting is overdue by 215 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 215 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 215 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 07 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 26 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 January 2020 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 09 January 2020 163 days late Download Open in new window