Trustees CARIBBEAN BIODIVERSITY FUND

Charity number: 1149889
Charity reporting is up to date (181 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karolin Troubetzkoy Chair 02 October 2020
None on record
Luis-Miguel Gutierrez Trustee 07 November 2022
None on record
Glenn Bannister Trustee 30 June 2022
None on record
Brenda Boddie-John Trustee 11 December 2020
None on record
Sixto Joaquin Inchaustegui Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record