Trustees HALCYON LONDON INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL
Charity number: 1150105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITA HALBRIGHT | Chair | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kolawole Ilori | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Hardie | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cutbill | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Osiur Rahman | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Blausten | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Threlfall | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Harris | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MATTHAEUS | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ACHIM BECK | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SEARS | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.