Financial history ARK CANCER CENTRE CHARITY

Charity number: 1149758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £250.47k £369.21k £270.10k £355.86k £142.00k
Total expenditure £93.02k £94.14k £58.26k £56.88k £173.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £50.00k