THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SPROWSTON WITH BEESTON ST ANDREW

Charity number: 1149140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 04 May 2016 On time Download