THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SPROWSTON WITH BEESTON ST ANDREW

Charity number: 1149140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW PHILIP HUDSON Trustee 26 September 2012 None on record
Bryan Timothy Carpenter Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
Peter John Coe Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
BARBARA KERRISON WINTER Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
SUSAN ELLINGHAM Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
REVEREND CANON SIMON COLIN STOKES Chair 26 September 2012 None on record
Julie Christine Cole Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record
VE FLYNN Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
Mary Susan Carpenter Trustee 02 April 2014 None on record
JACKIE BURT Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
SHEILA PHYLLIS TUFFIELD Trustee 26 September 2012
SPROWSTON SENIOR CITIZENS WELFARE COMMITTEE Received: 60 days late
ROBERT FRANCIS HUNTLY Trustee 26 September 2012 None on record
REV DEAN AKRILL BA Trustee 26 September 2012 None on record
Edward Hubart John STANLEY Trustee 22 April 2015 None on record
STEPHANIE MARY GRAND Trustee 26 September 2012 None on record
Donald Loone Trustee 17 April 2019 None on record
DAPHNIE ANN CULLINGTON Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
Keith John Lebbell Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record