ALBION STREET COMMUNITY CHARITY LTD

Charity number: 1153318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £38.93k £32.59k £31.60k £36.61k £39.52k
Total expenditure £36.75k £33.42k £31.16k £30.66k £30.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A