Financial history GIRLING & UPCHER EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1151206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £38.92k £38.92k £38.90k £39.09k £20.11k
Total expenditure £37.83k £39.97k £40.11k £39.74k £37.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A