Trustees MILL END BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1149363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clara Badu Amoah Trustee 27 April 2021
CROCUS TRUST TR (THREE RIVERS)
Received: 25 days late
Gary James Duke Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record
Rev James Harling John Findlow Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
Nick Corden Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Kerry Anne Maisey Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Geoff Hawkings Trustee 24 April 2017
ANGLICAN CHURCH PLANTING INITIATIVES
Overdue by 26 days