Accounts and annual returns GUBA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 February 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required