ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST, WINKFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the education of the children of the parish of Winkfield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 27 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Alison Blakemore | Chair | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Barry Sumner | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patrick Mukholi | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Menon | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Leyland | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANN SUMNER | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.13k | £16.13k | £16.17k | £15.45k | £17.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.73k | £5.56k | £33.38k | £18.48k | £16.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 25 AUGUST 1871 UNDER THE TERMS OF THE SCHOOL SITES ACT 1841 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 20 MAY 1896
Charitable objects
A SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN OF POOR PERSONS RESIDING IN OR NEAR THE PARISH OF WINKFIELD AFORESAID AS THE TRUSTEES OR TRUSTEE FOR THE TIME BEING OF THESE PRESENTS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT TO ADMIT THERETO AS WELL IN GENERAL KNOWLEDGE AS MORE ESPECIALLY BY TEACHING THEM THE LORDS PRAYER THE APOSTLES CREED AND THE TEN COMMANDMENTS AND THE CATECHISM NOW SET FORTH IN THE BOOK OF COMMON PRAYER AND NOW IN USE IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND FOR GENERAL RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION ACCORDING TO THE NOW EXISTING PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE SAID CHURCH. THE SAID PIECE OF LAND AND HEREDITAMENTS HEREBY CONVEYED (IN THE CONVEYANCE OF 20 MAY 1896) AND ANY BUILDING OR ERECTION TO BE ERECTED OR PLACED THEREON SHALL BE USED FOR NO PURPOSE WHATSOEVER OTHER THAN THE PURPOSES HEREINBEFORE DECLARED AND EXPRESSED AND IN PARTICULAR SHALL NOT WITHOUT THE CONSENT OF ALL THE SAID TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING BE USED AS A PLACE OF OR FOR THE PURPOSES OF PUBLIC DIVINE WORSHIP OR SERVICE PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH CONSENT SHALL IN NO CASE BE GIVEN SO AS IN ANYWAY TO CURTAIL OR INTERFERE WITH THE FREE AND UNINTERRUPTED ENJOYMENT OF THE WHOLE OF THE SCHOOL BUILDING FOR THE PURPOSES HEREINBEFORE DECLARED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Wellingtonias
Warfield Park
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG42 3RL
- Phone:
- 07543627637
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window