ABERGARWED WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 503181
Charity reporting is overdue by 510 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 510 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 510 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2021 727 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 March 2020 768 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 March 2020 1133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required