TROWBRIDGE TOWN HALL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1157085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 March 2017 On time Download