TROWBRIDGE TOWN HALL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1157085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID CHARLES CAVILL Trustee 07 November 2019
TROWBRIDGE TOWN TRUST Received: On time
ST. JAMES TRUST Received: On time
Richard Bryan Jotcham Trustee 10 November 2014
LIONS CLUB OF TROWBRIDGE Received: 1 day late
lyn patricia taylor Trustee 07 November 2019 None on record
Eleanor amber Massive-blomfield Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record
Mathew Stabb Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record
Peter Charles Mason Smith Trustee 14 December 2015 None on record
gemma novis Trustee 06 April 2020 None on record
thomas jarman Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record
simon tombs Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record
Colin Victor Kay Chair 14 December 2015 None on record
sarah hammond Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record
ROSEMARY ELLEN MACDONALD Trustee 07 November 2019
SARUM COLLEGE Received: On time