Financial history HELEN BAMBER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.07m £1.36m £1.69m £1.61m £2.16m
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.24m £1.42m £1.72m £1.82m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £842.46k £1.22m £1.54m £1.43m £1.97m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £7.08k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £225.70k £143.47k £143.67k £181.79k £189.20k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £651 £426 £1.03k £2.13k £1.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £921.17k £1.05m £1.22m £1.48m £1.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £191.20k £196.80k £201.58k £241.97k £254.27k
Expenditure - Governance £8.59k £9.32k £0 £9.14k £12.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0