Trustees HELEN BAMBER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR CHARLOTTE SEYMOUR-SMITH Chair 01 October 2015
None on record
Nancy McCartney Ms Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
John Scampion Trustee 02 April 2020
IMPROVING CHANCES FOR UGANDA
Received: On time
Samantha Peter Ms Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Janina Julia Kowalska Trustee 05 April 2018
NANN-K TRUST
Recently registered
Dr Ian Watt Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
Sir Nicolas Bratza Trustee 10 August 2015
THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF HUMAN RIGHTS
Received: On time
THE HUMAN RIGHTS TRUST
Received: On time