Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. BRIDES MAJOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1149274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.68k £8.22k £7.04k £1.03k £4.76k
Total expenditure £12.47k £9.29k £10.06k £1.25k £4.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A