CHURCH ON THE ROCK DOMINION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alleviating Poverty of the Spirit, Soul and Body; through the preaching of the gospel of Christ via one on one, print and electronic media. We help to restore broken relationships and marriages. We celebrate life and bring back hope where there is no hope; we commit ourselves to the teaching of the Bible. We take the love of God to the communities of People , restoring lives back to God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 11 October 2012: Standard registration
- 21 March 2013: Funds received from 1118847 CHURCH ON THE ROCK UK
- CHURCH ON THE ROCK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev OLABIYI AJALA | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr ABIODUN ADETOKUNBO GBOLAHAN POPOOLA | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADENIKE OLUYOMI POPOOLA | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLUSEYE ARIKAWE | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE NGONWE | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.46k | £29.07k | £31.47k | £34.15k | £39.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.43k | £23.87k | £27.60k | £43.61k | £34.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 December 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 December 2020 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/09/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ON THE ROCK DOMINION CENTRE
EVANGELICAL CHURCH
WALLIS AVENUE
PRITTLEWELL
SOUTHEND ON SEA
ESSEX
- Phone:
- +447888402449
- Email:
- admin@churchontherockuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window