Accounts and annual returns REACH FOR A STAR

Charity number: 1149735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 09 April 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required