BRIGHTON THERAPY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brighton Therapy Centre provides a wide range of high quality counselling, therapy and psychological services to the people of Brighton & Hove, Hastings & Rother and the surrounding areas. We believe that all sections of the community should have access to the right kind of treatment. Our service aims to provide this and to be a centre of clinical excellence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,570 from 2 government contract(s) and £6,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 04 December 2012: Standard registration
- BRIGHTON THERAPY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Scully | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Opelola Oluwa Akinyemi | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Burgess-Gamble | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clare | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandeep Rai | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Thompson | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.11k | £198.59k | £245.75k | £375.60k | £307.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.30k | £176.73k | £225.93k | £339.87k | £367.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.06k | £2.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.69k | N/A | £43.70k | £6.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/11/2011 as amended on 23 Mar 2023 as amended on 23 Oct 2023 as amended on 25 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
To relieve mental and emotional suffering, and advance wellbeing for people living in England and Wales by the provision of quality, appropriate and effective psychological therapies, for the public benefit.
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON, HOVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brighton Therapy Centre
23a New Road
Brighton
BN1 1UG
- Phone:
- 01273626444
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window