Accounts and annual returns CHILD FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1150187

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 442 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2019 | 01 April 2022 | 808 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2018 | 17 July 2019 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1535 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window