Accounts and annual returns GEOFFS PLACE LTD

Charity number: 1151020
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 09 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required