Financial history WISDOM HOSPICE SUPPORT

Charity number: 1155857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £209.13k £234.92k £299.33k £309.42k £416.51k
Total expenditure £210.66k £235.43k £267.61k £275.00k £241.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £162.89k £11.59k